Texas 2017 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1560 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Guillen (Senate Sponsor - Zaffirini) H.B. No. 1560
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 1, 2017;
 May 8, 2017, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Education; May 21, 2017, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 9, Nays 0; May 21, 2017, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the removal of an obsolete reference regarding
 open-enrollment charter schools and the State Board of Education.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 7.102(c)(9), Education Code, is
 repealed.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *