E | 06/15/2017 | Effective on 9/1/17 | ||
E | 06/15/2017 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 6064 | |
E | 05/30/2017 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 6062 | |
Senate | 05/30/2017 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 4242 | |
House | 05/29/2017 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 6059 | |
House | 05/28/2017 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 6061 | |
House | 05/25/2017 | Senate passage reported | Journal Page: 4817 | |
Senate | 05/24/2017 | Passed | Journal Page: 3031 | |
Senate | 05/24/2017 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 3031 | |
Senate | 05/24/2017 | Record vote | Journal Page: 3031 | |
Senate | 05/24/2017 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 3031 | |
Senate | 05/24/2017 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3031 | |
Senate | 05/24/2017 | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 3031 | |
Senate | 05/24/2017 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 3031 | |
Senate | 05/24/2017 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 05/22/2017 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 05/21/2017 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 05/21/2017 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 2449 | |
Senate | 05/18/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/18/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 05/18/2017 | Posting rule suspended | Journal Page: 2090 | |
Senate | 05/12/2017 | Referred to Criminal Justice | Journal Page: 1913 | |
Senate | 05/12/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1913 | |
Senate | 05/12/2017 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1905 | |
House | 05/11/2017 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 3456 | |
House | 05/11/2017 | Record vote | RV#1159 | Journal Page: 3264 |
House | 05/11/2017 | Passed | Journal Page: 3264 | |
House | 05/11/2017 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 3264 | |
House | 05/10/2017 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 3206 | |
House | 05/10/2017 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 3206 | |
House | 05/06/2017 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/04/2017 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/24/2017 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/23/2017 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/21/2017 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1803 | |
House | 04/17/2017 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/17/2017 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/17/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/10/2017 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/10/2017 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/10/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/10/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 02/14/2017 | Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence | Journal Page: 305 | |
House | 02/14/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 305 | |
House | 11/14/2016 | Filed |