Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1642 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Bell, Wu, Keough (Senate Sponsor - Kolkhorst) H.B. No. 1642
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 5, 2017;
 May 8, 2017, read first time and referred to Committee on Health &
 Human Services; May 17, 2017, reported favorably by the following
 vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 0; May 17, 2017, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to reporting requirements for investigations of abuse,
 neglect, or exploitation against residents of certain health
 facilities.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 260A.007(k), Health and Safety Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (k)  If the department determines the report of abuse,
 neglect, or exploitation is substantiated at the conclusion of the
 investigation, the [The] department shall make a complete final
 written report of the investigation and submit the report and its
 recommendations to the [district attorney and, if a law enforcement
 agency has not investigated the report of abuse, neglect,
 exploitation, or other complaint, to the] appropriate law
 enforcement agency.
 SECTION 2.  The changes in law made by this Act apply only to
 an investigation completed on or after the effective date of this
 Act.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *