Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1646 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Lozano, Herrero (Senate Sponsor - Hinojosa) H.B. No. 1646
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 1, 2017;
 May 4, 2017, read first time and referred to Committee on Veteran
 Affairs & Border Security; May 15, 2017, reported favorably by the
 following vote:  Yeas 6, Nays 0; May 15, 2017, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the waiver of certain fees for an assumed name
 certificate or a statement of abandonment of use of an assumed name
 filed by a military veteran.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 71.155, Business & Commerce Code, is
 amended by amending Subsection (a) and adding Subsection (a-1) to
 read as follows:
 (a)  Except as provided by Subsection (a-1), the [The] county
 clerk shall collect a fee of:
 (1)  $2 for filing each certificate or statement
 required or permitted to be filed under this chapter; and
 (2)  50 cents for each name to be indexed.
 (a-1)  The county clerk may waive all fees under Subsection
 (a) for a registrant who is a military veteran. In this subsection,
 "military veteran" has the meaning assigned by Section 55.001,
 Occupations Code.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *