Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1652 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 02/08/2017

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            85R9219 SRS-D
 By: Lang H.B. No. 1652


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to a study conducted by the Office of Court Administration
 of the Texas Judicial System on pending court matters.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter C, Chapter 72, Government Code, is
 amended by adding Section 72.034 to read as follows:
 Sec. 72.034.  STUDY ON PENDING MATTERS. (a)  Not later than
 September 1, 2018, the office shall conduct a study on pending court
 matters including:
 (1)  the backlog of current pending matters by county,
 judicial region, and type of matter;
 (2)  an analysis of the use of senior judges to assist
 in the reduction of pending matters; and
 (3)  recommendations to reduce pending matters and
 improve efficiency.
 (b)  Not later than January 1, 2019, the office shall issue a
 report on the study required under Subsection (a) to the governor,
 lieutenant governor, and speaker of the house of representatives.
 (c)  This section expires September 1, 2019.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2017.