Senate | 05/10/2017 | Referred to Transportation | Journal Page: 1797 | |
Senate | 05/10/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1797 | |
Senate | 05/10/2017 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1783 | |
House | 05/09/2017 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 3238 | |
House | 05/09/2017 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3061 | |
House | 05/09/2017 | Record vote | RV#1049 | Journal Page: 3061 |
House | 05/09/2017 | Passed | Journal Page: 3061 | |
House | 05/09/2017 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 3061 | |
House | 05/09/2017 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 3035 | |
House | 05/09/2017 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 3035 | |
House | 05/09/2017 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | ||
House | 05/08/2017 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | ||
House | 05/04/2017 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 05/04/2017 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/03/2017 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2646 | |
House | 04/28/2017 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/28/2017 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 04/28/2017 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/28/2017 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/20/2017 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/20/2017 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/20/2017 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/20/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/20/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 04/18/2017 | Posting rule suspended | Journal Page: 1569 | |
House | 03/06/2017 | Referred to Transportation | Journal Page: 559 | |
House | 03/06/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 559 | |
House | 02/08/2017 | Filed |