Texas 2017 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1698 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Kuempel (Senate Sponsor - Estes) H.B. No. 1698
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 27, 2017;
 May 4, 2017, read first time and referred to Committee on Business &
 Commerce; May 21, 2017, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 8, Nays 0; May 21, 2017, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the licensing and regulation of a journeyman industrial
 electrician.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 1305.002, Occupations Code, is amended
 by adding Subdivision (11-b) to read as follows:
 (11-b)  "Journeyman industrial electrician" means an
 individual who engages in electrical work exclusively at a business
 that operates a chemical plant, petrochemical plant, refinery,
 natural gas plant, natural gas treating plant, pipeline, or oil and
 gas exploration and production operation.
 SECTION 2.  Section 1305.102(a), Occupations Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (a)  The commission [executive director] shall adopt rules
 for the licensing of electricians, sign electricians, electrical
 sign contractors, electrical contractors, journeyman industrial
 electricians, journeyman linemen, residential appliance
 installers, and residential appliance installation contractors as
 prescribed by this chapter.
 SECTION 3.  Subchapter D, Chapter 1305, Occupations Code, is
 amended by adding Section 1305.1601 to read as follows:
 Sec. 1305.1601.  JOURNEYMAN INDUSTRIAL ELECTRICIAN.  An
 applicant for a license as a journeyman industrial electrician
 must:
 (1)  have at least 8,000 hours of on-the-job training
 as a licensed electrical apprentice under the supervision of a
 master electrician; and
 (2)  pass a journeyman industrial electrician
 examination administered under this chapter.
 SECTION 4.  Section 1305.162, Occupations Code, is amended
 by adding Subsection (e) to read as follows:
 (e)  Notwithstanding Subsection (b), an examination required
 for a license as a journeyman industrial electrician under Section
 1305.1601 may only test an applicant regarding activities performed
 by a journeyman industrial electrician at a location described by
 Section 1305.002(11-b).
 SECTION 5.  Section 1305.168(a), Occupations Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (a)  To renew a master electrician, journeyman electrician,
 master sign electrician, journeyman sign electrician, maintenance
 electrician, journeyman industrial electrician, journeyman
 lineman, or residential wireman license, the license holder must
 complete four hours of continuing education annually.
 SECTION 6.  Not later than September 1, 2018, the Texas
 Commission of Licensing and Regulation shall adopt rules as
 required by Section 1305.102, Occupations Code, as amended by this
 Act.
 SECTION 7.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *