House | 05/03/2017 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 05/03/2017 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 05/03/2017 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 05/03/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 05/03/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 04/26/2017 | Meeting cancelled | ||
House | 04/26/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 04/17/2017 | Referred to Juvenile Justice & Family Issues | Journal Page: 1540 | |
House | 04/17/2017 | Correction in referral | Journal Page: 1540 | |
House | 03/06/2017 | Referred to Public Education | Journal Page: 564 | |
House | 03/06/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 564 | |
House | 02/09/2017 | Filed |