House | 05/03/2017 | Laid on the table subject to call | Journal Page: 2372 | |
House | 05/03/2017 | Companion considered in lieu of | SB 259 | Journal Page: 2372 |
House | 04/27/2017 | Postponed | 5/3/17 9:00 AM | Journal Page: 2050 |
House | 04/27/2017 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2050 | |
House | 04/27/2017 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/20/2017 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/19/2017 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 03/27/2017 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 03/27/2017 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 03/24/2017 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 866 | |
House | 03/21/2017 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 03/21/2017 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/21/2017 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 03/21/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/21/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/14/2017 | Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence | Journal Page: 650 | |
House | 03/14/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 650 | |
House | 02/10/2017 | Filed |