E
|
05/29/2017
|
Effective on 9/1/17
|
|
|
E
|
05/29/2017
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6064
|
E
|
05/22/2017
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 4575
|
Senate
|
05/22/2017
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2478
|
House
|
05/20/2017
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 3993
|
House
|
05/19/2017
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 4004
|
House
|
05/19/2017
|
Senate passage reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3886
|
Senate
|
05/19/2017
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2117
|
Senate
|
05/19/2017
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2117
|
Senate
|
05/19/2017
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2117
|
Senate
|
05/19/2017
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2117
|
Senate
|
05/19/2017
|
Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 2117
|
Senate
|
05/19/2017
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2117
|
Senate
|
05/19/2017
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 2117
|
Senate
|
05/18/2017
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2017
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2017
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 2021
|
Senate
|
05/15/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2017
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2017
|
Referred to Agriculture, Water, & Rural Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 1661
|
Senate
|
05/04/2017
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1661
|
Senate
|
04/24/2017
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1233
|
House
|
04/21/2017
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2017
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1804
|
House
|
04/20/2017
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1715
|
House
|
04/20/2017
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1712
|
House
|
04/20/2017
|
Record vote
|
RV#322
|
Journal Page: 1715
|
House
|
04/20/2017
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1715
|
House
|
04/20/2017
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1715
|
House
|
04/20/2017
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 1697
|
House
|
04/20/2017
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1697
|
House
|
04/19/2017
|
Rules suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1679
|
House
|
04/17/2017
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2017
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2017
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2017
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1448
|
House
|
04/04/2017
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2017
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2017
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2017
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2017
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2017
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2017
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2017
|
Referred to Culture, Recreation & Tourism
|
|
Journal Page: 651
|
House
|
03/14/2017
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 651
|
House
|
02/13/2017
|
Filed
|
|
|