Senate
|
05/22/2017
|
No action taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2017
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2017
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2447
|
Senate
|
05/19/2017
|
Referred to Administration
|
|
Journal Page: 2206
|
Senate
|
05/19/2017
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2206
|
Senate
|
05/19/2017
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 2146
|
House
|
05/19/2017
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 4004
|
House
|
05/19/2017
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3785
|
House
|
05/19/2017
|
Record vote
|
RV#1358
|
Journal Page: 3784
|
House
|
05/19/2017
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3784
|
House
|
05/19/2017
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3784
|
House
|
05/19/2017
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 3751
|
House
|
05/19/2017
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3751
|
House
|
05/19/2017
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2017
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2017
|
Returned to Local & Consent Calendars Comm.
|
|
Journal Page: 3397
|
House
|
05/12/2017
|
Withdrawn from calendar
|
|
Journal Page: 3397
|
House
|
05/12/2017
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2017
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2017
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2017
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2017
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 2886
|
House
|
05/04/2017
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2017
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2017
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2017
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2017
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2017
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2017
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2017
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2017
|
Recommendations filed with the Speaker
|
|
Journal Page: 866
|
House
|
03/15/2017
|
Referred to Special Purpose Districts
|
|
Journal Page: 687
|
House
|
03/15/2017
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 687
|
House
|
02/15/2017
|
Transmitted to the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
02/13/2017
|
Filed
|
|
|