1 | | - | By: Geren (Senate Sponsor - Kolkhorst) H.B. No. 1829 |
---|
2 | | - | (In the Senate - Received from the House April 10, 2017; |
---|
3 | | - | April 24, 2017, read first time and referred to Committee on |
---|
4 | | - | Administration; May 9, 2017, reported favorably by the following |
---|
5 | | - | vote: Yeas 6, Nays 0; May 9, 2017, sent to printer.) |
---|
6 | | - | Click here to see the committee vote |
---|
| 1 | + | H.B. No. 1829 |
---|
10 | 4 | | AN ACT |
---|
11 | 5 | | relating to the preservation, maintenance, and improvement of the |
---|
12 | 6 | | Capitol and the Capitol grounds. |
---|
13 | 7 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
14 | 8 | | SECTION 1. Section 443.030, Government Code, is amended to |
---|
15 | 9 | | read as follows: |
---|
16 | 10 | | Sec. 443.030. SUPPORT ORGANIZATIONS. (a) The board may |
---|
17 | 11 | | establish, maintain, and participate in the operation of one or |
---|
18 | 12 | | more organizations of persons whose purpose is to raise funds for or |
---|
19 | 13 | | provide services or other benefits to the board. The [Such an] |
---|
20 | 14 | | organization may be incorporated as a Texas nonprofit corporation. |
---|
21 | 15 | | (b) The board shall contract with a nonprofit corporation |
---|
22 | 16 | | formed to assist in the preservation, maintenance, and improvement |
---|
23 | 17 | | of the Capitol and the Capitol grounds to develop and implement a |
---|
24 | 18 | | plan for the solicitation and acceptance of gifts, grants, devises, |
---|
25 | 19 | | and bequests of money, other property, and services to be used to |
---|
26 | 20 | | preserve, maintain, and improve the Capitol and the Capitol |
---|
27 | 21 | | grounds. The board may contract with a nonprofit corporation |
---|
28 | 22 | | described by Subsection (a) or another nonprofit corporation. |
---|
29 | 23 | | SECTION 2. The State Preservation Board shall enter into |
---|
30 | 24 | | the contract required by Section 443.030, Government Code, as |
---|
31 | 25 | | amended by this Act, not later than September 1, 2018. |
---|
32 | 26 | | SECTION 3. This Act takes effect September 1, 2017. |
---|
33 | | - | * * * * * |
---|
| 27 | + | ______________________________ ______________________________ |
---|
| 28 | + | President of the Senate Speaker of the House |
---|
| 29 | + | I certify that H.B. No. 1829 was passed by the House on April |
---|
| 30 | + | 6, 2017, by the following vote: Yeas 144, Nays 0, 1 present, not |
---|
| 31 | + | voting. |
---|
| 32 | + | ______________________________ |
---|
| 33 | + | Chief Clerk of the House |
---|
| 34 | + | I certify that H.B. No. 1829 was passed by the Senate on May |
---|
| 35 | + | 11, 2017, by the following vote: Yeas 30, Nays 1. |
---|
| 36 | + | ______________________________ |
---|
| 37 | + | Secretary of the Senate |
---|
| 38 | + | APPROVED: _____________________ |
---|
| 39 | + | Date |
---|
| 40 | + | _____________________ |
---|
| 41 | + | Governor |
---|