Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1829 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Geren (Senate Sponsor - Kolkhorst) H.B. No. 1829
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 10, 2017;
 April 24, 2017, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Administration; May 9, 2017, reported favorably by the following
 vote:  Yeas 6, Nays 0; May 9, 2017, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the preservation, maintenance, and improvement of the
 Capitol and the Capitol grounds.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 443.030, Government Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 Sec. 443.030.  SUPPORT ORGANIZATIONS. (a) The board may
 establish, maintain, and participate in the operation of one or
 more organizations of persons whose purpose is to raise funds for or
 provide services or other benefits to the board. The [Such an]
 organization may be incorporated as a Texas nonprofit corporation.
 (b)  The board shall contract with a nonprofit corporation
 formed to assist in the preservation, maintenance, and improvement
 of the Capitol and the Capitol grounds to develop and implement a
 plan for the solicitation and acceptance of gifts, grants, devises,
 and bequests of money, other property, and services to be used to
 preserve, maintain, and improve the Capitol and the Capitol
 grounds. The board may contract with a nonprofit corporation
 described by Subsection (a) or another nonprofit corporation.
 SECTION 2.  The State Preservation Board shall enter into
 the contract required by Section 443.030, Government Code, as
 amended by this Act, not later than September 1, 2018.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *