Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1904 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Capriglione (Senate Sponsor - Burton) H.B. No. 1904
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 5, 2017;
 May 16, 2017, read first time and referred to Committee on State
 Affairs; May 19, 2017, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 9, Nays 0; May 19, 2017, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the powers and compensation of criminal law magistrates
 in Tarrant County.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 54.653, Government Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 Sec. 54.653.  COMPENSATION. (a) A full-time magistrate is
 entitled to the salary determined by the Commissioners Court of
 Tarrant County.
 (b)  The salary of a full-time magistrate may not exceed 90
 percent of the sum of:
 (1)  [be less than] the salary [authorized to be] paid
 to a district judge by the state under Section 659.012; and
 (2)  the maximum amount of county contributions and
 supplements allowed by law to be paid to a district judge under
 Section 659.012 [master for family law cases appointed under
 Subchapter A].
 (c)  The salary of a part-time magistrate is equal to the
 per-hour salary of a full-time magistrate. The per-hour salary is
 determined by dividing the annual salary by a 2,080 work-hour year.
 The judges of the courts trying criminal cases in Tarrant County
 shall approve the number of hours for which a part-time magistrate
 is to be paid.
 (d)  A [The] magistrate's salary is paid from the county fund
 available for payment of officers' salaries.
 SECTION 2.  Section 54.656(a), Government Code, is amended
 to read as follows:
 (a)  A judge may refer to a magistrate any criminal case or
 matter relating to a criminal case for proceedings involving:
 (1)  a negotiated plea of guilty or no contest and
 sentencing before the court;
 (2)  a bond forfeiture, remittitur, and related
 proceedings;
 (3)  a pretrial motion;
 (4)  a [postconviction] writ of habeas corpus;
 (5)  an examining trial;
 (6)  an occupational driver's license;
 (7)  a petition for an [agreed] order of expunction
 under Chapter 55, Code of Criminal Procedure;
 (8)  an asset forfeiture hearing as provided by Chapter
 59, Code of Criminal Procedure;
 (9)  a petition for an [agreed] order of nondisclosure
 of criminal history record information or an order of nondisclosure
 of criminal history record information that does not require a
 petition provided by Subchapter E-1, Chapter 411;
 (10)  a [hearing on a] motion to modify or revoke
 community supervision or to proceed with an adjudication of guilt
 [probation]; [and]
 (11)  setting conditions, modifying, revoking, and
 surrendering of bonds, including surety bonds;
 (12)  specialty court proceedings;
 (13)  a waiver of extradition; and
 (14)  any other matter the judge considers necessary
 and proper.
 SECTION 3.  Section 54.658, Government Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 Sec. 54.658.  POWERS. (a)  Except as limited by an order of
 referral, a magistrate to whom a case is referred may:
 (1)  conduct hearings;
 (2)  hear evidence;
 (3)  compel production of relevant evidence;
 (4)  rule on admissibility of evidence;
 (5)  issue summons for the appearance of witnesses;
 (6)  examine witnesses;
 (7)  swear witnesses for hearings;
 (8)  make findings of fact on evidence;
 (9)  formulate conclusions of law;
 (10)  rule on a pretrial motion;
 (11)  recommend the rulings, orders, or judgment to be
 made in a case;
 (12)  regulate proceedings in a hearing;
 (13)  accept a plea of guilty from a defendant charged
 with misdemeanor, felony, or both misdemeanor and felony offenses;
 (14)  select a jury;
 (15)  accept a negotiated plea on a probation
 revocation;
 (16)  conduct a contested probation revocation
 hearing;
 (17)  sign a dismissal in a misdemeanor case; [and]
 (18)  in any case referred under Section 54.656(a)(1),
 accept a negotiated plea of guilty or no contest and:
 (A)  enter a finding of guilt and impose or
 suspend the sentence; or
 (B)  defer adjudication of guilt; and
 (19)  do any act and take any measure necessary and
 proper for the efficient performance of the duties required by the
 order of referral.
 (b)  A magistrate may sign a motion to dismiss submitted by
 an attorney representing the state on cases referred to the
 magistrate, or on dockets called by the magistrate, and may
 consider unadjudicated cases at sentencing under Section 12.45,
 Penal Code.
 (c)  A magistrate has all of the powers of a magistrate under
 the laws of this state and may administer an oath for any purpose.
 (d)  A magistrate does not have authority under Article
 18.01(c), Code of Criminal Procedure, to issue a subsequent search
 warrant under Article 18.02(10), Code of Criminal Procedure.
 SECTION 4.  The changes in law made by Sections 2 and 3 of
 this Act apply to a matter or case referred to a magistrate on or
 after the effective date of this Act. A matter or case referred to a
 magistrate before the effective date of this Act is governed by the
 law in effect immediately before that date, and that law is
 continued in effect for that purpose.
 SECTION 5.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *