Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1905 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Guillen (Senate Sponsor - Hall) H.B. No. 1905
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 5, 2017;
 May 16, 2017, read first time and referred to Committee on Veteran
 Affairs & Border Security; May 18, 2017, reported favorably by the
 following vote:  Yeas 7, Nays 0; May 18, 2017, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to general officers within the Texas Military Department.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 437.058, Government Code, is amended by
 amending Subsections (a), (d), (e), and (f) and adding Subsection
 (d-1) to read as follows:
 (a)  The adjutant general may appoint as general officers one
 or more [an] assistant deputy adjutants [adjutant] general for
 army, an assistant deputy adjutant general for air, an assistant
 [deputy] adjutant general for homeland security, and an assistant
 [deputy] adjutant general for domestic operations [government
 affairs].
 (d)  The assistant deputy adjutants [adjutant] general for
 [the] army shall support the deputy adjutant general for [the]
 army, represent the command staff at events as needed, and manage
 the activities assigned by the adjutant general or the deputy
 adjutant general for [the] army.
 (d-1)  The assistant deputy adjutant general for air shall
 support the deputy adjutant general for air, represent the command
 staff at events as needed, and manage the activities assigned by the
 adjutant general or the deputy adjutant general for air.
 (e)  The assistant [deputy] adjutant general for homeland
 security [the Army National Guard or the Air National Guard], as
 determined by the adjutant general, shall:
 (1)  coordinate with other state agencies in matters
 pertaining to homeland security [to ensure state emergency services
 are provided and organized to support the state operations center];
 and
 (2)  coordinate homeland security actions taken by the
 National Guard Bureau in this state.
 (f)  The assistant [deputy] adjutant general for domestic
 operations [the Army National Guard or the Air National Guard, as
 determined by the adjutant general,] shall:
 (1)  coordinate activities of the Texas military forces
 with the National Guard Bureau to ensure state emergency services
 are provided and organized to support the state operations center;
 and
 (2)  coordinate with other federal, state, and local
 jurisdictions and officials [funding and coordination with other
 federal, state, and local jurisdictions and officials in matters
 relating to the operations of the Texas military forces occurring
 in the assistant deputy adjutant general's jurisdiction or
 oversight].
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *