1 | | - | By: Frullo (Senate Sponsor - Perry) H.B. No. 1930 |
---|
2 | | - | (In the Senate - Received from the House April 26, 2017; |
---|
3 | | - | May 11, 2017, read first time and referred to Committee on State |
---|
4 | | - | Affairs; May 15, 2017, reported favorably by the following vote: |
---|
5 | | - | Yeas 9, Nays 0; May 15, 2017, sent to printer.) |
---|
6 | | - | Click here to see the committee vote |
---|
| 1 | + | H.B. No. 1930 |
---|
10 | 4 | | AN ACT |
---|
11 | 5 | | relating to financial accounting and reporting requirements for |
---|
12 | 6 | | this state and political subdivisions of this state. |
---|
13 | 7 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
14 | 8 | | SECTION 1. Chapter 2266, Government Code, is repealed. |
---|
15 | 9 | | SECTION 2. Section 112.002, Local Government Code, is |
---|
16 | 10 | | amended by adding Subsection (c) to read as follows: |
---|
17 | 11 | | (c) A regulation adopted under this section may not be |
---|
18 | 12 | | inconsistent with generally accepted accounting principles as |
---|
19 | 13 | | established by the Governmental Accounting Standards Board. |
---|
20 | 14 | | SECTION 3. The changes in law made by this Act apply to |
---|
21 | 15 | | financial accounting and reporting by a governmental entity that, |
---|
22 | 16 | | immediately before the effective date of this Act, was subject to |
---|
23 | 17 | | Chapter 2266, Government Code, as repealed by this Act, beginning |
---|
24 | 18 | | with the governmental entity's first fiscal year that begins on or |
---|
25 | 19 | | after September 1, 2018. |
---|
26 | 20 | | SECTION 4. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives |
---|
27 | 21 | | a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as |
---|
28 | 22 | | provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this |
---|
29 | 23 | | Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this |
---|
30 | 24 | | Act takes effect September 1, 2017. |
---|
31 | | - | * * * * * |
---|
| 25 | + | ______________________________ ______________________________ |
---|
| 26 | + | President of the Senate Speaker of the House |
---|
| 27 | + | I certify that H.B. No. 1930 was passed by the House on April |
---|
| 28 | + | 25, 2017, by the following vote: Yeas 145, Nays 0, 2 present, not |
---|
| 29 | + | voting. |
---|
| 30 | + | ______________________________ |
---|
| 31 | + | Chief Clerk of the House |
---|
| 32 | + | I certify that H.B. No. 1930 was passed by the Senate on May |
---|
| 33 | + | 19, 2017, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0. |
---|
| 34 | + | ______________________________ |
---|
| 35 | + | Secretary of the Senate |
---|
| 36 | + | APPROVED: _____________________ |
---|
| 37 | + | Date |
---|
| 38 | + | _____________________ |
---|
| 39 | + | Governor |
---|