Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1930 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Frullo (Senate Sponsor - Perry) H.B. No. 1930
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 26, 2017;
 May 11, 2017, read first time and referred to Committee on State
 Affairs; May 15, 2017, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 9, Nays 0; May 15, 2017, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to financial accounting and reporting requirements for
 this state and political subdivisions of this state.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Chapter 2266, Government Code, is repealed.
 SECTION 2.  Section 112.002, Local Government Code, is
 amended by adding Subsection (c) to read as follows:
 (c)  A regulation adopted under this section may not be
 inconsistent with generally accepted accounting principles as
 established by the Governmental Accounting Standards Board.
 SECTION 3.  The changes in law made by this Act apply to
 financial accounting and reporting by a governmental entity that,
 immediately before the effective date of this Act, was subject to
 Chapter 2266, Government Code, as repealed by this Act, beginning
 with the governmental entity's first fiscal year that begins on or
 after September 1, 2018.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *