House | 04/27/2017 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/27/2017 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 04/27/2017 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/27/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/13/2017 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/13/2017 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/13/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/10/2017 | No action taken in committee | ||
House | 04/10/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 04/06/2017 | Posting rule suspended | Journal Page: 1274 | |
House | 04/06/2017 | Referred to County Affairs | Journal Page: 1421 | |
House | 04/06/2017 | Correction in referral | Journal Page: 1421 | |
House | 03/13/2017 | Referred to Elections | Journal Page: 628 | |
House | 03/13/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 628 | |
House | 02/15/2017 | Filed |