Senate | 05/03/2017 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1620 | |
House | 05/03/2017 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 2646 | |
House | 05/03/2017 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2359 | |
House | 05/03/2017 | Record vote | RV#677 | Journal Page: 2358 |
House | 05/03/2017 | Passed | Journal Page: 2358 | |
House | 05/03/2017 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2358 | |
House | 05/02/2017 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2285 | |
House | 05/02/2017 | Record vote | RV#615 | Journal Page: 2285 |
House | 05/02/2017 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 2285 | |
House | 05/02/2017 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2285 | |
House | 05/02/2017 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/28/2017 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/27/2017 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/26/2017 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/26/2017 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2074 | |
House | 04/24/2017 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/24/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/17/2017 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/17/2017 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/17/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/17/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/15/2017 | Referred to Pensions | Journal Page: 694 | |
House | 03/15/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 694 | |
House | 02/16/2017 | Filed |