Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1989 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Shine, Oliveira (Senate Sponsor - Zaffirini) H.B. No. 1989
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 1, 2017;
 May 4, 2017, read first time and referred to Committee on Business
 and Commerce; May 17, 2017, reported favorably by the following
 vote:  Yeas 8, Nays 0; May 17, 2017, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the requirements for withdrawal by a certified
 self-insurer from workers' compensation self-insurance.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 407.045, Labor Code, is amended by
 adding Subsection (a-1) to read as follows:
 (a-1)  For purposes of Subsection (a), an adequate program
 includes a program in which the certified self-insurer has insured
 or reinsured all workers' compensation obligations incurred by the
 self-insurer with an authorized insurer under an agreement that is
 filed with and approved in writing by the commissioner. The
 obligations incurred include:
 (1)  all known claims and expenses associated with
 those claims; and
 (2)  all incurred but not reported claims and expenses
 associated with those claims.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *