Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2002 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Lozano (Senate Sponsor - Seliger) H.B. No. 2002
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 5, 2017;
 May 8, 2017, read first time and referred to Committee on Higher
 Education; May 12, 2017, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 6, Nays 0; May 12, 2017, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the location of the Irma Rangel College of Pharmacy.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 89.051(b), Education Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 (b)  The college shall be known as The Texas A&M University
 System Health Science Center Irma Lerma Rangel College of Pharmacy,
 and the primary building in which the school is operated shall be
 located in Kleberg County and must include "Irma Rangel" in its
 official name.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *