Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2007 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Cosper, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Buckingham) H.B. No. 2007
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 18, 2017;
 May 2, 2017, read first time and referred to Committee on Veteran
 Affairs & Border Security; May 11, 2017, reported favorably by the
 following vote:  Yeas 6, Nays 0; May 11, 2017, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the licensing and regulation of certain military
 dentists and dental hygienists who provide voluntary charity dental
 or dental hygiene care.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter C, Chapter 256, Occupations Code, is
 amended by adding Section 256.1017 to read as follows:
 Sec. 256.1017.  MILITARY LIMITED VOLUNTEER LICENSE. (a)
 The board shall adopt rules relating to the issuance of a military
 limited volunteer license under this section.
 (b)  The board may issue a military limited volunteer license
 to practice dentistry to a dentist or a military limited volunteer
 license to practice dental hygiene to a dental hygienist who:
 (1)  is licensed and in good standing, or was licensed
 and retired in good standing, as a dentist or dental hygienist in
 another state;
 (2)  is or was authorized as a dentist or dental
 hygienist to treat personnel enlisted in a branch of the United
 States armed forces or veterans; and
 (3)  meets any other requirement prescribed by board
 rule.
 (c)  The board may not issue a license under this section to
 an applicant who:
 (1)  holds a dental or dental hygienist license that:
 (A)  is currently under active investigation; or
 (B)  is or was subject to a disciplinary order or
 action or to denial by another jurisdiction;
 (2)  holds a license to prescribe, dispense,
 administer, supply, or sell a controlled substance that:
 (A)  is currently under active investigation; or
 (B)  is or was subject to a disciplinary order or
 action or to denial by another jurisdiction; or
 (3)  has been convicted of, is on deferred adjudication
 community supervision or deferred disposition for, or is under
 active investigation for the commission of:
 (A)  a felony; or
 (B)  a misdemeanor involving moral turpitude.
 (d)  A dentist or dental hygienist may practice dentistry or
 dental hygiene under a license issued under this section only at a
 clinic that primarily treats indigent patients. The dentist or
 dental hygienist may not receive compensation for dental or dental
 hygiene services rendered at the clinic.
 (e)  A military limited volunteer license holder is subject
 to board rules, including rules regarding disciplinary action,
 license registration and renewal, and continuing education.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *