House | 05/10/2017 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/09/2017 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/09/2017 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 3238 | |
House | 05/06/2017 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/06/2017 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 03/13/2017 | Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence | Journal Page: 630 | |
House | 03/13/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 630 | |
House | 02/16/2017 | Filed |