House | 05/06/2017 | Postponed | 6/18/17 10:00 AM | Journal Page: 2852 |
House | 05/06/2017 | Laid out as postponed business | Journal Page: 2852 | |
House | 05/05/2017 | Postponed | 5/6/17 1:00 PM | Journal Page: 2737 |
House | 05/05/2017 | Laid out as postponed business | Journal Page: 2736 | |
House | 05/05/2017 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2729 | |
House | 05/05/2017 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/01/2017 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/17/2017 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/17/2017 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/13/2017 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1541 | |
House | 04/04/2017 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/04/2017 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/04/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/21/2017 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/21/2017 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/21/2017 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 03/21/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/21/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/13/2017 | Referred to Homeland Security & Public Safety | Journal Page: 632 | |
House | 03/13/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 632 | |
House | 02/17/2017 | Filed |