Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2056 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Oliveira (Senate Sponsor - Zaffirini) H.B. No. 2056
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 24, 2017;
 May 1, 2017, read first time and referred to Committee on Business &
 Commerce; May 9, 2017, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 7, Nays 0; May 9, 2017, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to access by the division of workers' compensation to
 certain designated doctor contracts under the workers'
 compensation system.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 408.1225, Labor Code, is amended by
 adding Subsections (g) and (h) to read as follows:
 (g)  On request of the division, a designated doctor shall
 provide the division with a copy of any contract that is:
 (1)  between the designated doctor and an authorized
 agent of the doctor; and
 (2)  for services provided by the agent related to the
 designated doctor's duties, including scheduling, billing, and
 organizing medical records.
 (h)  A contract provided to the division under Subsection (g)
 is not subject to disclosure under Chapter 552, Government Code.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *