Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2060 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Oliveira (Senate Sponsor - Zaffirini) H.B. No. 2060
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 18, 2017;
 April 26, 2017, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Business & Commerce; May 10, 2017, reported favorably by the
 following vote:  Yeas 7, Nays 0; May 10, 2017, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the eligibility requirements for employment as an
 ombudsman of the Office of Injured Employee Counsel under the Texas
 Workers' Compensation Act.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 404.152(b), Labor Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 (b)  To be eligible for designation as an ombudsman, a person
 must:
 (1)  demonstrate satisfactory knowledge of the
 requirements of:
 (A)  this subtitle and the provisions of Subtitle
 C that relate to claims management;
 (B)  other laws relating to workers'
 compensation; and
 (C)  rules adopted under this subtitle and the
 laws described under Subdivision (1)(B);
 (2)  have demonstrated experience in handling and
 resolving problems for the general public; and
 (3)  possess strong interpersonal skills[; and
 [(4) have at least one year of demonstrated experience
 in the field of workers' compensation].
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *