Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2064 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Anderson of Dallas, Rinaldi H.B. No. 2064
 (Senate Sponsor - Huffines)
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 5, 2017;
 May 8, 2017, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Intergovernmental Relations; May 12, 2017, reported favorably by
 the following vote:  Yeas 6, Nays 0; May 12, 2017, sent to
 printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to quorum and voting requirements for the transaction of
 business by the board of the Irving Flood Control District Section
 III of Dallas County.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter B, Chapter 7805, Special District
 Local Laws Code, is amended by adding Section 7805.054 to read as
 follows:
 Sec. 7805.054.  QUORUM; VOTE REQUIRED. A quorum consists of
 three directors.  An action or recommendation of the board
 requiring a vote of the board is not valid unless:
 (1)  the action or recommendation is approved by a
 record vote taken at a meeting of the board with a quorum present;
 and
 (2)  the action or recommendation receives at least
 three affirmative votes by board members.
 SECTION 2.  (a) All governmental and proprietary actions
 and proceedings of the Irving Flood Control District Section III of
 Dallas County taken before the effective date of this Act are
 validated, ratified, and confirmed in all respects as of the dates
 on which they occurred.
 (b)  This section does not apply to any matter that on the
 effective date of this Act:
 (1)  is involved in litigation if the litigation
 ultimately results in the matter being held invalid by a final court
 judgment; or
 (2)  has been held invalid by a final court judgment.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *