Texas 2017 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2095 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/15/2017

                    By: Kuempel (Senate Sponsor - Zaffirini) H.B. No. 2095
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 18, 2017;
 April 24, 2017, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Business & Commerce; May 15, 2017, reported favorably by the
 following vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 0; May 15, 2017, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to transfer of a plumber's license number on the
 retirement or death of the plumber.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 1301.359(b), Occupations Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (b)  Except as provided by Section 1301.406, the number of a
 license, endorsement, or registration issued under this chapter is
 not assignable or transferable.
 SECTION 2.  Section 1301.406, Occupations Code, is amended
 to read as follows:
 Sec. 1301.406.  TRANSFER OF LICENSE NUMBER. (a) On approval
 by the board, a person who holds an unexpired license under this
 chapter and whose license has been held continuously for at least 35
 [50] consecutive years may transfer the license number on the date
 of the person's retirement or death to another person who:
 (1)  is related within the second degree by
 consanguinity to the transferor; and
 (2)  holds a license issued [as a journeyman plumber or
 master plumber] under this chapter that is the same type of license
 as the license held by the transferor.
 (b)  The application for a [license] transfer of a license
 number under this section must include the transferor's consent and
 a designation of whether the license number will transfer on the
 retirement or death of the transferor.
 (c)  The board shall transfer a license number to a person
 who submits an application and presents evidence satisfactory to
 the board that:
 (1)  the person meets the requirements under
 Subsections (a)(1) and (a)(2); and
 (2)  the transferor is retired or dead.
 SECTION 3.  As soon as practicable after the effective date
 of this Act, the Texas State Board of Plumbing Examiners shall adopt
 rules necessary to implement Section 1301.406, Occupations Code, as
 amended by this Act.
 SECTION 4.  Not later than January 1, 2018, the Texas State
 Board of Plumbing Examiners shall begin accepting applications for
 the transfer of license numbers under Section 1301.406, Occupations
 Code, as amended by this Act.
 SECTION 5.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *