Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2095 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1-By: Kuempel (Senate Sponsor - Zaffirini) H.B. No. 2095
2- (In the Senate - Received from the House April 18, 2017;
3- April 24, 2017, read first time and referred to Committee on
4- Business & Commerce; May 15, 2017, reported favorably by the
5- following vote: Yeas 9, Nays 0; May 15, 2017, sent to printer.)
6-Click here to see the committee vote
1+H.B. No. 2095
72
83
9- A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
104 AN ACT
115 relating to transfer of a plumber's license number on the
126 retirement or death of the plumber.
137 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
148 SECTION 1. Section 1301.359(b), Occupations Code, is
159 amended to read as follows:
1610 (b) Except as provided by Section 1301.406, the number of a
1711 license, endorsement, or registration issued under this chapter is
1812 not assignable or transferable.
1913 SECTION 2. Section 1301.406, Occupations Code, is amended
2014 to read as follows:
2115 Sec. 1301.406. TRANSFER OF LICENSE NUMBER. (a) On approval
2216 by the board, a person who holds an unexpired license under this
2317 chapter and whose license has been held continuously for at least 35
2418 [50] consecutive years may transfer the license number on the date
2519 of the person's retirement or death to another person who:
2620 (1) is related within the second degree by
2721 consanguinity to the transferor; and
2822 (2) holds a license issued [as a journeyman plumber or
2923 master plumber] under this chapter that is the same type of license
3024 as the license held by the transferor.
3125 (b) The application for a [license] transfer of a license
3226 number under this section must include the transferor's consent and
3327 a designation of whether the license number will transfer on the
3428 retirement or death of the transferor.
3529 (c) The board shall transfer a license number to a person
3630 who submits an application and presents evidence satisfactory to
3731 the board that:
3832 (1) the person meets the requirements under
3933 Subsections (a)(1) and (a)(2); and
4034 (2) the transferor is retired or dead.
4135 SECTION 3. As soon as practicable after the effective date
4236 of this Act, the Texas State Board of Plumbing Examiners shall adopt
4337 rules necessary to implement Section 1301.406, Occupations Code, as
4438 amended by this Act.
4539 SECTION 4. Not later than January 1, 2018, the Texas State
4640 Board of Plumbing Examiners shall begin accepting applications for
4741 the transfer of license numbers under Section 1301.406, Occupations
4842 Code, as amended by this Act.
4943 SECTION 5. This Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
50- * * * * *
44+ ______________________________ ______________________________
45+ President of the Senate Speaker of the House
46+ I certify that H.B. No. 2095 was passed by the House on April
47+ 13, 2017, by the following vote: Yeas 138, Nays 0, 3 present, not
48+ voting.
49+ ______________________________
50+ Chief Clerk of the House
51+ I certify that H.B. No. 2095 was passed by the Senate on May
52+ 19, 2017, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0.
53+ ______________________________
54+ Secretary of the Senate
55+ APPROVED: _____________________
56+ Date
57+ _____________________
58+ Governor