By: Kuempel (Senate Sponsor - Zaffirini) H.B. No. 2095 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 18, 2017; April 24, 2017, read first time and referred to Committee on Business & Commerce; May 15, 2017, reported favorably by the following vote: Yeas 9, Nays 0; May 15, 2017, sent to printer.) Click here to see the committee vote A BILL TO BE ENTITLED AN ACT relating to transfer of a plumber's license number on the retirement or death of the plumber. BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: SECTION 1. Section 1301.359(b), Occupations Code, is amended to read as follows: (b) Except as provided by Section 1301.406, the number of a license, endorsement, or registration issued under this chapter is not assignable or transferable. SECTION 2. Section 1301.406, Occupations Code, is amended to read as follows: Sec. 1301.406. TRANSFER OF LICENSE NUMBER. (a) On approval by the board, a person who holds an unexpired license under this chapter and whose license has been held continuously for at least 35 [50] consecutive years may transfer the license number on the date of the person's retirement or death to another person who: (1) is related within the second degree by consanguinity to the transferor; and (2) holds a license issued [as a journeyman plumber or master plumber] under this chapter that is the same type of license as the license held by the transferor. (b) The application for a [license] transfer of a license number under this section must include the transferor's consent and a designation of whether the license number will transfer on the retirement or death of the transferor. (c) The board shall transfer a license number to a person who submits an application and presents evidence satisfactory to the board that: (1) the person meets the requirements under Subsections (a)(1) and (a)(2); and (2) the transferor is retired or dead. SECTION 3. As soon as practicable after the effective date of this Act, the Texas State Board of Plumbing Examiners shall adopt rules necessary to implement Section 1301.406, Occupations Code, as amended by this Act. SECTION 4. Not later than January 1, 2018, the Texas State Board of Plumbing Examiners shall begin accepting applications for the transfer of license numbers under Section 1301.406, Occupations Code, as amended by this Act. SECTION 5. This Act takes effect September 1, 2017. * * * * *