Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2097 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Geren (Senate Sponsor - Watson) H.B. No. 2097
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 27, 2017;
 May 3, 2017, read first time and referred to Committee on Business &
 Commerce; May 15, 2017, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 7, Nays 0; May 15, 2017, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the sale of malt liquor, ale, and beer by the holder of a
 brewpub license.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 74.08(a), Alcoholic Beverage Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (a)  In addition to the activities authorized by Section
 74.01, the holder of a brewpub license who holds a wine and beer
 retailer's permit and whose sale of beer, ale, or malt liquor
 consists only of beer, ale, or malt liquor [who sells alcoholic
 beverages] manufactured [only] on the brewpub's premises may:
 (1)  sell malt liquor or ale produced under the license
 to those retailers or qualified persons to whom the holder of a
 general class B wholesaler's permit may sell malt liquor or ale
 under Section 20.01; and
 (2)  sell beer produced under the license to:
 (A)  those retailers to whom the holder of a
 general distributor's license may sell beer under Section 64.01; or
 (B)  qualified persons to whom the holder of a
 general distributor's license may sell beer for shipment and
 consumption outside the state under Section 64.01.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *