Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HB210 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Springer (Senate Sponsor - Taylor of Collin) H.B. No. 210
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 5, 2017;
 May 8, 2017, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Administration; May 22, 2017, reported favorably by the following
 vote:  Yeas 7, Nays 0; May 22, 2017, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to designating March 21 as BRAVE Day.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter C, Chapter 662, Government Code, is
 amended by adding Section 662.065 to read as follows:
 Sec. 662.065.  BRAVE DAY. (a)  March 21 is Breast
 Reconstruction Advocacy and Education Day, or BRAVE Day, to promote
 breast reconstruction advocacy and education, and the rights and
 choices women have for prevention of, treatment for, and recovery
 from breast cancer.
 (b)  BRAVE Day shall be regularly observed by appropriate
 programs and activities.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *