Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2124 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Minjarez, Miller, Blanco H.B. No. 2124
 (Senate Sponsor - Kolkhorst)
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 18, 2017;
 April 24, 2017, read first time and referred to Committee on Health &
 Human Services; May 16, 2017, reported favorably by the following
 vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 0; May 16, 2017, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the procedures for identifying and notifying relevant
 federal agencies about certain child abuse and neglect
 investigations.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 261.301, Family Code, is amended by
 adding Subsection (j) to read as follows:
 (j)  In an investigation of a report of abuse or neglect
 allegedly committed by a person responsible for a child's care,
 custody, or welfare, the department shall determine whether the
 person is an active duty member of the United States armed forces or
 the spouse of a member on active duty. If the department determines
 the person is an active duty member of the United States armed
 forces or the spouse of a member on active duty, the department
 shall notify the United States Department of Defense Family
 Advocacy Program at the closest active duty military installation
 of the investigation.
 SECTION 2.  The changes in law made by this Act to Section
 261.301, Family Code, apply only to a report of abuse or neglect
 made on or after the effective date of this Act. A report made
 before that date is governed by the law in effect on the date the
 report was made, and the former law is continued in effect for that
 purpose.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *