Texas 2017 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2194 Introduced / Bill

Filed 02/21/2017

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    85R11197 JRJ-D
 By: King of Parker H.B. No. 2194


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the board of trustees of the Weatherford Junior College
 District.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter E, Chapter 130, Education Code, is
 amended by adding Section 130.0828 to read as follows:
 Sec. 130.0828.  ADDITIONAL TRUSTEES FOR WEATHERFORD JUNIOR
 COLLEGE DISTRICT. (a)  Notwithstanding any other law, in addition
 to the members of the board of trustees of the Weatherford Junior
 College District elected or appointed under other provisions of
 this subchapter, the commissioners court of each county in which a
 branch campus of the district is located and that imposes a branch
 campus maintenance tax under Section 130.253 shall appoint two
 members to serve on the district's board of trustees.
 (b)  Members of the board of trustees appointed under this
 section serve two-year terms and may be appointed to serve
 successive terms.  The commissioners court shall appoint initial
 members to serve a term beginning December 1, 2017.
 (c)  Except as provided by Subsection (d), a member of the
 board of trustees appointed under this section may participate in
 the decision-making of the board to the same extent as any other
 member of the board, including by voting on any budget that affects
 the entire district.
 (d)  A member of the board of trustees appointed under this
 section:
 (1)  may not participate in the decision-making of the
 board in matters related to:
 (A)  the imposition of a tax; or
 (B)  an issue that only affects a campus located
 in the junior college district;
 (2)  is not counted for purposes of determining whether
 a quorum of the board is present for the purpose of Subdivision (1);
 and
 (3)  may not serve as an officer of the board of
 trustees.
 (e)  Unless this section is continued in effect by the
 legislature, this section expires on December 1, 2027.
 SECTION 2.  The commissioners court of each county to which
 Section 130.0828, Education Code, as added by this Act, applies
 shall appoint the initial members of the board of trustees of the
 Weatherford Junior College District under that section not later
 than November 30, 2017.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2017.