Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2194 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: King of Parker, Springer, Lang H.B. No. 2194
 (Senate Sponsor - Estes)
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 24, 2017;
 May 1, 2017, read first time and referred to Committee on Natural
 Resources & Economic Development; May 4, 2017, reported favorably
 by the following vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 1; May 4, 2017, sent to
 printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the board of trustees of the Weatherford Junior College
 District.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter E, Chapter 130, Education Code, is
 amended by adding Section 130.0828 to read as follows:
 Sec. 130.0828.  ADDITIONAL TRUSTEES FOR WEATHERFORD JUNIOR
 COLLEGE DISTRICT. (a)  Notwithstanding any other law, in addition
 to the members of the board of trustees of the Weatherford Junior
 College District elected or appointed under other provisions of
 this subchapter, the commissioners court of each county in which a
 branch campus of the district is located and that imposed a branch
 campus maintenance tax under Section 130.253 on September 1, 2017,
 shall appoint one member to serve on the district's board of
 trustees.
 (b)  Members of the board of trustees appointed under this
 section serve two-year terms and may be appointed to serve
 successive terms.  The commissioners court shall appoint initial
 members to serve a term beginning December 1, 2017.
 (c)  Except as provided by Subsection (d), a member of the
 board of trustees appointed under this section may participate in
 the decision-making of the board to the same extent as any other
 member of the board, including by voting on any budget that affects
 the entire district.
 (d)  A member of the board of trustees appointed under this
 section:
 (1)  may not participate in the decision-making of the
 board in matters related to:
 (A)  the imposition of a tax; or
 (B)  an issue that only affects a campus located
 in the junior college district;
 (2)  is not counted for purposes of determining whether
 a quorum of the board is present for the purpose of Subdivision (1);
 and
 (3)  may not serve as an officer of the board of
 trustees.
 (e)  Unless this section is continued in effect by the
 legislature, this section expires on December 1, 2027.
 SECTION 2.  The commissioners court of each county to which
 Section 130.0828, Education Code, as added by this Act, applies
 shall appoint the initial members of the board of trustees of the
 Weatherford Junior College District under that section not later
 than November 30, 2017.
 SECTION 3.  SEVERABILITY. (a) It is the intent of the
 legislature that every provision, section, subsection, sentence,
 clause, phrase, and word in this Act, and every application of the
 provisions in this Act to each local law, are severable from each
 other. All constitutionally valid and lawful applications of this
 Act shall be severed from an application that a court finds to be
 invalid, leaving the valid applications in force because it is the
 legislature's intent and priority that the valid applications be
 allowed to stand alone.
 (b)  A court may not decline to enforce the severability
 requirements in this Act on the ground that the enforcement of the
 severability requirements would be contrary to legislative intent.
 The legislature hereby declares that it intends for the
 severability requirements of this Act to be enforced as written,
 without any exceptions.
 (c)  A court may not decline to enforce the severability
 requirements of this Act on the ground that the Act's provisions or
 applications are essentially and inseparably connected. The
 legislature hereby declares that it intends for the severability
 requirements of this Act to be enforced without regard to whether
 this Act's provisions or applications are essentially and
 inseparably connected.
 (d)  If a final court order or judgment finds that the
 composition of the board of trustees of the Weatherford Junior
 College District as composed under this Act is invalid, the
 court-ordered remedy shall require the appointment of members of
 the board of trustees by the commissioners court of each county in
 which a branch campus of the district is located in the manner
 described by Section 130.0828, Education Code, as added by this
 Act, so that the composition of the board of trustees complies with
 applicable law.
 (e)  Section 311.032(a), Government Code, applies to this
 Act.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *