Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2285 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Thompson of Brazoria, et al. H.B. No. 2285
 (Senate Sponsor - Taylor of Galveston)
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 8, 2017;
 May 9, 2017, read first time and referred to Committee on Higher
 Education; May 17, 2017, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 6, Nays 0; May 17, 2017, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the establishment of the Texas Institute for Coastal
 Prairie Research and Education at the University of Houston.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Chapter 111, Education Code, is amended by
 adding Subchapter J to read as follows:
 SUBCHAPTER J. TEXAS INSTITUTE FOR COASTAL PRAIRIE RESEARCH AND
 EDUCATION
 Sec. 111.141.  DEFINITIONS.  In this subchapter:
 (1)  "Board" means the board of regents of the
 University of Houston System.
 (2)  "Institute" means the Texas Institute for Coastal
 Prairie Research and Education established under this subchapter.
 Sec. 111.142.  ESTABLISHMENT.  (a)  The Texas Institute for
 Coastal Prairie Research and Education is established at the
 University of Houston.
 (b)  The organization, control, and management of the
 institute are vested in the board.
 Sec. 111.143.  POWERS AND DUTIES.  The institute shall:
 (1)  conduct environmental research and education on
 coastal prairie and prairie restoration;
 (2)  provide a setting for other entities to conduct
 environmental research and education on coastal prairie and prairie
 restoration; and
 (3)  provide national leadership and education
 regarding the best methods to restore coastal prairie.
 Sec. 111.144.  COLLABORATION WITH OTHER ENTITIES.  The
 University of Houston shall encourage public or private entities to
 participate in or support the operation of the institute and may
 enter into an agreement with any public or private entity for that
 purpose.  An agreement may allow the institute to provide
 information, services, or other assistance to an entity in exchange
 for the entity's participation or support.
 Sec. 111.145.  GIFTS AND GRANTS.  The board may solicit,
 accept, and administer gifts and grants from any public or private
 source for the purposes of the institute.
 Sec. 111.146.  PERSONNEL.  The board may employ personnel
 for the institute as necessary.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *