Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2329 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 02/23/2017

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            85R8792 CAE-D
 By: Burkett H.B. No. 2329


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to elimination of the authority of certain county school
 districts to impose ad valorem taxes and to a procedure under which
 those districts may be abolished.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.   (a) This section only applies to a county
 school district in a county with a population of 2.2 million or more
 and that is adjacent to a county with a population of more than
 600,000.
 (b)  On or after January 1, 2018, a county school district
 may not impose an ad valorem tax.
 (c)  An ad valorem tax formerly assessed by a county school
 district shall continue to be assessed by the county on behalf of
 the district solely for the purpose of paying the principal of and
 interest on any bonds issued by the district until all bonds are
 paid in full. This subsection applies only to a bond issued before
 the effective date of this Act for which the tax receipts were
 obligated. On payment of all bonds issued by the county school
 district, the ad valorem tax may not be assessed.
 (d)  In the manner provided by rule of the commissioner of
 education, the county shall collect any delinquent taxes imposed by
 or on behalf of the county school district and distribute the
 collected delinquent taxes that are not obligated to pay bonds to
 the component school districts in the county in proportionate
 shares equal to the proportion that the membership in each district
 bears to total membership in the county as of May 1, 2017.
 (e)  A county school district shall be abolished in
 accordance with this section unless component school districts with
 75 percent or more of the student population for all school
 districts in the county elect each school year to participate in
 services offered by the county school district. Beginning at the
 end of the 2017-2018 school year, the commissioner of education
 shall determine at the end of each school year whether the county
 school district achieved the required participation level during
 that year. If the county school district failed to achieve that
 level, a dissolution committee shall be formed as provided by
 Subsection (f) of this section, and the county school district,
 board of county school trustees, and office of county school
 superintendent are abolished effective September 1 of the year
 following the year in which the dissolution committee is formed.
 (f)  As soon as practicable, a dissolution committee shall be
 formed for a county school district to be abolished as provided by
 Subsection (e) of this section. The dissolution committee is
 responsible for all financial decisions for the county school
 district to be abolished, including asset distribution and payment
 of all debt obligations.
 (g)  A dissolution committee required by Subsection (f) of
 this section shall be appointed by the comptroller and include:
 (1)  one financial advisor;
 (2)  one chief financial officer employed by a school
 district located in the same county as the county school district
 for which the dissolution committee is formed; and
 (3)  one certified public accountant.
 (h)  The dissolution committee is subject to the open
 meetings requirements under Chapter 551, Government Code, and
 public information requirements under Chapter 552, Government
 Code.
 (i)  Members of the dissolution committee may not receive
 compensation but are entitled to reimbursement for actual and
 necessary expenses incurred in performing the functions of the
 dissolution committee.
 (j)  The dissolution committee shall determine the manner in
 which all assets, liabilities, contracts, and services of the
 county school district to be abolished are divided, transferred, or
 discontinued. The dissolution committee shall create a sinking
 fund to deposit all money received in the abolishment of the county
 school district for the payment of all debts of the county school
 district.
 (k)  The dissolution committee shall distribute the assets
 remaining after discharge of the liabilities of the county school
 district to the component school districts in the county in
 proportionate shares equal to the proportion that the membership in
 each district bears to total membership in the county as of May 1 of
 the year the county school district is abolished. The dissolution
 committee shall liquidate county school district assets as
 necessary to discharge county school district liabilities and
 facilitate the distribution of assets. A person authorized by the
 dissolution committee shall execute any documents necessary to
 complete the transfer of assets, liabilities, or contracts.
 (l)  The dissolution committee shall encourage the component
 school districts to:
 (1)  continue sharing services previously received
 through the county school district; and
 (2)  give preference to private sector contractors to
 continue services previously provided by the county school
 district.
 (m)  The chief financial officer and financial advisor for
 the county school district shall provide assistance to the
 dissolution committee in abolishing the county school district.
 (n)  The Texas Education Agency shall provide assistance to a
 dissolution committee in the distribution of assets, liabilities,
 contracts, and services of a county school district abolished by
 this Act.
 (o)  Any dissolution committee created as provided by this
 Act is abolished on the date all debt obligations of the county
 school district are paid in full and all assets distributed to
 component school districts.
 (p)  For purposes of Subsection (g) of this section,
 "financial advisor" includes a person or business entity who acts
 as a financial advisor, financial consultant, money or investment
 manager, or broker.
 SECTION 2.  Subchapter G, Chapter 11, Education Code, is
 amended by adding Section 11.305 to read as follows:
 Sec. 11.305.  COUNTYWIDE EQUALIZATION TAX PROHIBITED IN
 CERTAIN COUNTIES. Notwithstanding former Chapter 18, as that
 chapter existed on May 1, 1995, a county school district in a county
 with a population of 2.2 million or more and that is adjacent to a
 county with a population of more than 600,000 may not levy, assess,
 or collect a countywide equalization tax.
 SECTION 3.  Section 45.002, Education Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 Sec. 45.002.  MAINTENANCE TAXES. (a) Except as provided by
 Subsection (b), the [The] governing board of an independent school
 district, including the city council or commission that has
 jurisdiction over a municipally controlled independent school
 district, the governing board of a rural high school district, and
 the commissioners court of a county, on behalf of each common school
 district under its jurisdiction, may levy, assess, and collect
 annual ad valorem taxes for the further maintenance of public
 schools in the district, subject to Section 45.003.
 (b)  A county school district in a county with a population
 of 2.2 million or more and that is adjacent to a county with a
 population of more than 600,000 may not levy, assess, or collect
 annual ad valorem taxes for the maintenance of a public school.
 SECTION 4.  Section 11.305, Education Code, as added by this
 Act, and Section 45.002, Education Code, as amended by this Act,
 apply beginning with the 2018 tax year. Notwithstanding Section
 11.305, Education Code, as added by this Act, or Section 45.002,
 Education Code, as amended by this Act, a county school district may
 collect annual ad valorem taxes levied or assessed for the 2017 or
 an earlier tax year.
 SECTION 5.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2017.