E | 06/15/2017 | Vetoed by the Governor | Journal Page: 6066 | |
E | 05/26/2017 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 5683 | |
Senate | 05/26/2017 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 3567 | |
House | 05/25/2017 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 5092 | |
House | 05/24/2017 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 5095 | |
House | 05/23/2017 | Senate passage reported | Journal Page: 4567 | |
Senate | 05/23/2017 | Passed | Journal Page: 2584 | |
Senate | 05/23/2017 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2584 | |
Senate | 05/23/2017 | Record vote | Journal Page: 2584 | |
Senate | 05/23/2017 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 2584 | |
Senate | 05/23/2017 | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 2584 | |
Senate | 05/23/2017 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2584 | |
Senate | 05/23/2017 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 2584 | |
Senate | 05/23/2017 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/21/2017 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 05/21/2017 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 2448 | |
Senate | 05/19/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/05/2017 | Referred to Agriculture, Water, & Rural Affairs | Journal Page: 1684 | |
Senate | 05/05/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1684 | |
Senate | 05/05/2017 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1680 | |
House | 05/05/2017 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 2886 | |
House | 05/04/2017 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2595 | |
House | 05/04/2017 | Record vote | RV#804 | Journal Page: 2595 |
House | 05/04/2017 | Passed | Journal Page: 2595 | |
House | 05/04/2017 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2595 | |
House | 05/03/2017 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2433 | |
House | 05/03/2017 | Record vote | RV#709 | Journal Page: 2432 |
House | 05/03/2017 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 2432 | |
House | 05/03/2017 | Amended | 1-Oliverson | Journal Page: 2432 |
House | 05/03/2017 | Point of order overruled | Rule 8, Section 1(c) | Journal Page: 2432 |
House | 05/03/2017 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2432 | |
House | 05/03/2017 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/28/2017 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/26/2017 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/26/2017 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/25/2017 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1982 | |
House | 04/19/2017 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/19/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/05/2017 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/05/2017 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/05/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/05/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/20/2017 | Referred to Natural Resources | Journal Page: 739 | |
House | 03/20/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 739 | |
House | 02/23/2017 | Filed |