Senate | 05/01/2017 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1365 | |
House | 04/28/2017 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 2190 | |
House | 04/28/2017 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2094 | |
House | 04/28/2017 | Record vote | RV#535 | Journal Page: 2093 |
House | 04/28/2017 | Passed | Journal Page: 2093 | |
House | 04/28/2017 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2093 | |
House | 04/27/2017 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2038 | |
House | 04/27/2017 | Record vote | RV#505 | Journal Page: 2037 |
House | 04/27/2017 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 2037 | |
House | 04/27/2017 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2037 | |
House | 04/26/2017 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/19/2017 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/18/2017 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/17/2017 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/17/2017 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1574 | |
House | 04/12/2017 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/12/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/05/2017 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/05/2017 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/05/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/05/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/16/2017 | Referred to Ways & Means | Journal Page: 721 | |
House | 03/16/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 721 | |
House | 02/23/2017 | Filed |