E | 06/14/2017 | Effective on 9/1/17 | ||
E | 06/14/2017 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 6064 | |
E | 05/22/2017 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 4575 | |
Senate | 05/22/2017 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 2478 | |
House | 05/20/2017 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 3993 | |
House | 05/19/2017 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 4004 | |
House | 05/19/2017 | Senate passage reported | Journal Page: 3886 | |
Senate | 05/19/2017 | Passed | Journal Page: 2122 | |
Senate | 05/19/2017 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2122 | |
Senate | 05/19/2017 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 2122 | |
Senate | 05/19/2017 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2122 | |
Senate | 05/19/2017 | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 2122 | |
Senate | 05/19/2017 | Record vote | Journal Page: 2122 | |
Senate | 05/19/2017 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 2122 | |
Senate | 05/18/2017 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/17/2017 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 05/17/2017 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 2072 | |
Senate | 05/16/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/16/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 05/10/2017 | Referred to Criminal Justice | Journal Page: 1798 | |
Senate | 05/10/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1798 | |
Senate | 05/08/2017 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1696 | |
House | 05/06/2017 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 3026 | |
House | 05/06/2017 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2804 | |
House | 05/06/2017 | Record vote | RV#930 | Journal Page: 2803 |
House | 05/06/2017 | Passed | Journal Page: 2803 | |
House | 05/06/2017 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2803 | |
House | 05/05/2017 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 2707 | |
House | 05/05/2017 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2707 | |
House | 05/04/2017 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/02/2017 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/21/2017 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/20/2017 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/20/2017 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1802 | |
House | 04/12/2017 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/12/2017 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/12/2017 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/06/2017 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/06/2017 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/06/2017 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/06/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/06/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 04/05/2017 | Posting rule suspended | Journal Page: 1102 | |
House | 03/16/2017 | Referred to County Affairs | Journal Page: 721 | |
House | 03/16/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 721 | |
House | 02/23/2017 | Filed |