Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2359 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Ortega, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Rodríguez) H.B. No. 2359
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 8, 2017;
 May 10, 2017, read first time and referred to Committee on Criminal
 Justice; May 17, 2017, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 7, Nays 1; May 17, 2017, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to common nuisances.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 125.0015(a), Civil Practice and Remedies
 Code, is amended to read as follows:
 (a)  A person who maintains a place to which persons
 habitually go for the following purposes and who knowingly
 tolerates the activity and furthermore fails to make reasonable
 attempts to abate the activity maintains a common nuisance:
 (1)  discharge of a firearm in a public place as
 prohibited by the Penal Code;
 (2)  reckless discharge of a firearm as prohibited by
 the Penal Code;
 (3)  engaging in organized criminal activity as a
 member of a combination as prohibited by the Penal Code;
 (4)  delivery, possession, manufacture, or use of a
 [controlled] substance or other item in violation of Chapter 481,
 Health and Safety Code;
 (5)  gambling, gambling promotion, or communicating
 gambling information as prohibited by the Penal Code;
 (6)  prostitution, promotion of prostitution, or
 aggravated promotion of prostitution as prohibited by the Penal
 Code;
 (7)  compelling prostitution as prohibited by the Penal
 Code;
 (8)  commercial manufacture, commercial distribution,
 or commercial exhibition of obscene material as prohibited by the
 Penal Code;
 (9)  aggravated assault as described by Section 22.02,
 Penal Code;
 (10)  sexual assault as described by Section 22.011,
 Penal Code;
 (11)  aggravated sexual assault as described by Section
 22.021, Penal Code;
 (12)  robbery as described by Section 29.02, Penal
 Code;
 (13)  aggravated robbery as described by Section 29.03,
 Penal Code;
 (14)  unlawfully carrying a weapon as described by
 Section 46.02, Penal Code;
 (15)  murder as described by Section 19.02, Penal Code;
 (16)  capital murder as described by Section 19.03,
 Penal Code;
 (17)  continuous sexual abuse of young child or
 children as described by Section 21.02, Penal Code;
 (18)  massage therapy or other massage services in
 violation of Chapter 455, Occupations Code;
 (19)  employing a minor at a sexually oriented business
 as defined by Section 243.002, Local Government Code;
 (20)  trafficking of persons as described by Section
 20A.02, Penal Code;
 (21)  sexual conduct or performance by a child as
 described by Section 43.25, Penal Code; [or]
 (22)  employment harmful to a child as described by
 Section 43.251, Penal Code;
 (23)  criminal trespass as described by Section 30.05,
 Penal Code;
 (24)  disorderly conduct as described by Section 42.01,
 Penal Code;
 (25)  arson as described by Section 28.02, Penal Code;
 (26)  criminal mischief as described by Section 28.03,
 Penal Code, that causes a pecuniary loss of $500 or more; or
 (27)  a graffiti offense in violation of Section 28.08,
 Penal Code.
 SECTION 2.  Section 125.046(a), Civil Practice and Remedies
 Code, is amended to read as follows:
 (a)  If, in any judicial proceeding under Subchapter A, a
 court determines that a person is maintaining a vacant lot, vacant
 or abandoned building, or multiunit residential property that is a
 common nuisance, the court may, on its own motion or on the motion
 of any party, order the appointment of a receiver to manage the
 property or render any other order allowed by law as necessary to
 abate the nuisance.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *