Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2386 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Bailes, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Nichols) H.B. No. 2386
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 24, 2017;
 May 3, 2017, read first time and referred to Committee on Natural
 Resources & Economic Development; May 17, 2017, reported favorably
 by the following vote:  Yeas 10, Nays 0; May 17, 2017, sent to
 printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to volunteer firefighter supervision of outdoor burning of
 waste consisting of plant growth.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 382.018(d), Health and Safety Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (d)  The commission may not control or prohibit outdoor
 burning of waste consisting of trees, brush, grass, leaves, branch
 trimmings, or other plant growth if:
 (1)  the person burning the waste is doing so at a site:
 (A)  designated for consolidated burning of waste
 generated from specific residential properties;
 (B)  located in a county with a population of less
 than 50,000;
 (C)  located outside of a municipality; and
 (D)  supervised at the time of the burning by:
 (i)  an employee of a fire department who is
 part of the fire protection personnel, as defined by Section
 419.021, Government Code, of the department and is acting in the
 scope of the person's employment; or
 (ii)  a volunteer firefighter acting in the
 scope of the firefighter's volunteer duties; and
 (2)  the waste was generated from a property for which
 the site is designated.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *