Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2424 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 02/24/2017

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            85R10856 SLB-F
 By: Howard H.B. No. 2424


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the territory of the Barton Springs-Edwards Aquifer
 Conservation District.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 8802.003, Special District Local Laws
 Code, is amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 8802.003.  DISTRICT TERRITORY.  (a)  The district is
 composed of:
 (1)  the territory described by the Texas Water
 Commission's August 15, 1986, order, as that territory may have
 been modified under:
 (A) [(1)]  Subchapter J, Chapter 36, Water Code;
 or
 (B) [(2)]  other law; and
 (2)  the territory described as follows:
 Beginning at a point at the intersection of the district
 boundary as it existed on January 1, 2017, and IH-35 and East
 William Cannon Drive, then running east on East William Cannon
 Drive to a point where East William Cannon Drive intersects Bluff
 Springs Road, then south and southeasterly along Bluff Springs Road
 to a point where Bluff Springs Road intersects the district
 boundary as it existed on January 1, 2017, then west and
 southwesterly turning northeasterly along the district boundary as
 it existed on January 1, 2017, to the place of beginning.
 (b)  A boundary reference in Subsection (a) to a road,
 highway, or drive means the centerline, as of January 1, 2017, of
 the road, highway, or drive.
 SECTION 2.  Section 8802.053, Special District Local Laws
 Code, is amended by adding Subsection (f) to read as follows:
 (f)  If the district is required to create single-member
 districts that do not comply with other provisions of this section
 in order to satisfy standards under federal law, the board of
 directors shall revise the single-member districts as the board
 considers appropriate to comply with those federal standards.
 SECTION 3.  The board of directors of the Barton
 Springs-Edwards Aquifer Conservation District shall add the
 territory described by Section 8802.003(a)(2), Special District
 Local Laws Code, as added by this Act, to single-member district
 number four, as that district existed on May 26, 2016.
 SECTION 4.  (a)  The legal notice of the intention to
 introduce this Act, setting forth the general substance of this
 Act, has been published as provided by law, and the notice and a
 copy of this Act have been furnished to all persons, agencies,
 officials, or entities to which they are required to be furnished
 under Section 59, Article XVI, Texas Constitution, and Chapter 313,
 Government Code.
 (b)  The governor, one of the required recipients, has
 submitted the notice and Act to the Texas Commission on
 Environmental Quality.
 (c)  The Texas Commission on Environmental Quality has filed
 its recommendations relating to this Act with the governor, the
 lieutenant governor, and the speaker of the house of
 representatives within the required time.
 (d)  All requirements of the constitution and laws of this
 state and the rules and procedures of the legislature with respect
 to the notice, introduction, and passage of this Act are fulfilled
 and accomplished.
 SECTION 5.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2017.