House | 05/10/2017 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/08/2017 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 05/04/2017 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/04/2017 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/03/2017 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2646 | |
House | 04/28/2017 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/28/2017 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/20/2017 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/20/2017 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/20/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/20/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/22/2017 | Referred to Transportation | Journal Page: 792 | |
House | 03/22/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 792 | |
House | 02/27/2017 | Filed |