E | 06/15/2017 | Vetoed by the Governor | Journal Page: 6066 | |
E | 05/30/2017 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 6062 | |
Senate | 05/29/2017 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 4237 | |
House | 05/28/2017 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 6032 | |
House | 05/27/2017 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 6040 | |
House | 05/25/2017 | Senate passage reported | Journal Page: 4823 | |
Senate | 05/24/2017 | Passed | Journal Page: 3040 | |
Senate | 05/24/2017 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 3040 | |
Senate | 05/24/2017 | Record vote | Journal Page: 3040 | |
Senate | 05/24/2017 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 3040 | |
Senate | 05/24/2017 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3040 | |
Senate | 05/24/2017 | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 3040 | |
Senate | 05/24/2017 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 3040 | |
Senate | 05/24/2017 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 05/17/2017 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 05/17/2017 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 05/17/2017 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 2072 | |
Senate | 05/16/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/16/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 05/09/2017 | Referred to Business & Commerce | Journal Page: 1761 | |
Senate | 05/09/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1761 | |
Senate | 05/08/2017 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1696 | |
House | 05/05/2017 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 2886 | |
House | 05/05/2017 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2657 | |
House | 05/05/2017 | Record vote | RV#843 | Journal Page: 2657 |
House | 05/05/2017 | Passed | Journal Page: 2657 | |
House | 05/05/2017 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2657 | |
House | 05/04/2017 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 2636 | |
House | 05/04/2017 | Amended | 1-Price | Journal Page: 2635 |
House | 05/04/2017 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2635 | |
House | 05/04/2017 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/28/2017 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/27/2017 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/26/2017 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/26/2017 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2074 | |
House | 04/19/2017 | Withdrawn from schedule | ||
House | 04/19/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 04/17/2017 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/17/2017 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/12/2017 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/12/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/12/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/21/2017 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 764 | |
House | 03/21/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 764 | |
House | 02/27/2017 | Filed |