Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2463 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1-By: Price (Senate Sponsor - Hughes) H.B. No. 2463
2- (In the Senate - Received from the House May 8, 2017;
3- May 9, 2017, read first time and referred to Committee on Business &
4- Commerce; May 17, 2017, reported favorably by the following vote:
5- Yeas 8, Nays 0; May 17, 2017, sent to printer.)
6-Click here to see the committee vote
1+H.B. No. 2463
72
83
9- A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
104 AN ACT
115 relating to requiring state agencies to develop written succession
126 plans.
137 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
148 SECTION 1. Chapter 321, Government Code, is amended by
159 adding Section 321.024 to read as follows:
1610 Sec. 321.024. STATE AGENCY'S SUCCESSION PLAN. (a) In this
1711 section, "state agency" has the meaning assigned by Section
1812 651.011.
1913 (b) The State Auditor shall include in the State Auditor's
2014 annual report on classified employee turnover:
2115 (1) a list of each state agency that has submitted a
2216 written succession plan under Section 651.011 to the State Auditor
2317 and each state agency that has failed to submit a written succession
2418 plan under that section; and
2519 (2) a thorough and comprehensive summary of the types
2620 and extent of succession planning completed by state agencies.
2721 SECTION 2. Chapter 651, Government Code, is amended by
2822 adding Section 651.011 to read as follows:
2923 Sec. 651.011. SUCCESSION PLAN. (a) In this section, "state
3024 agency" means a department, board, commission, or other agency in
3125 the executive branch of state government. The term does not include
3226 an institution of higher education, as defined by Section 61.003,
3327 Education Code.
3428 (b) A state agency shall develop a written succession plan:
3529 (1) identifying and developing mechanisms to ensure
3630 the transfer of institutional knowledge from experienced and
3731 retiring employees who are not appointed by the governor or the
3832 governing body of the state agency to succeeding employees; and
3933 (2) identifying the skills and abilities necessary for
4034 the development of the succeeding employees.
4135 (c) At least annually, the state agency shall update the
4236 written succession plan developed under Subsection (b). The updated
4337 written succession plan must include a report on the implementation
4438 of the mechanisms, skills, and abilities identified and developed
4539 in the previous written succession plan.
4640 (d) A state agency shall include in the state agency's
4741 legislative appropriations request a provision stating whether the
4842 state agency has developed a written succession plan as required by
4943 Subsection (b).
5044 (e) Not later than September 1 of each year, a state agency
5145 shall submit the written succession plan required under Subsection
5246 (b) to the state auditor and post the written succession plan on the
5347 state agency's Internet website.
5448 SECTION 3. Not later than September 1, 2018, a state agency
5549 under Section 651.011, Government Code, as added by this Act, shall
5650 submit the agency's initial succession plan as required by that
5751 section.
5852 SECTION 4. This Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
59- * * * * *
53+ ______________________________ ______________________________
54+ President of the Senate Speaker of the House
55+ I certify that H.B. No. 2463 was passed by the House on May 5,
56+ 2017, by the following vote: Yeas 144, Nays 0, 1 present, not
57+ voting.
58+ ______________________________
59+ Chief Clerk of the House
60+ I certify that H.B. No. 2463 was passed by the Senate on May
61+ 24, 2017, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0.
62+ ______________________________
63+ Secretary of the Senate
64+ APPROVED: _____________________
65+ Date
66+ _____________________
67+ Governor