5 | 3 | | |
---|
6 | 4 | | |
---|
7 | 5 | | A BILL TO BE ENTITLED |
---|
8 | 6 | | AN ACT |
---|
9 | 7 | | relating to a study on the assessments used by the Board of Pardons |
---|
10 | 8 | | and Paroles to make parole decisions. |
---|
11 | 9 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
12 | 10 | | SECTION 1. Subchapter E, Chapter 508, Government Code, is |
---|
13 | 11 | | amended by adding Section 508.1446 to read as follows: |
---|
14 | 12 | | Sec. 508.1446. STUDY ON ASSESSMENTS USED DURING PAROLE |
---|
15 | 13 | | DECISIONS. (a) The board shall conduct a study on the |
---|
16 | 14 | | effectiveness of the assessment components of the parole guidelines |
---|
17 | 15 | | adopted under Section 508.144 and used by the board and parole |
---|
18 | 16 | | panels in determining which inmates should be released on parole. |
---|
19 | 17 | | (b) In conducting the study, the board: |
---|
20 | 18 | | (1) shall obtain information on inmates considered for |
---|
21 | 19 | | parole during the period beginning January 1, 2015, and ending |
---|
22 | 20 | | December 31, 2017, from the Texas Board of Criminal Justice, the |
---|
23 | 21 | | department, and any other criminal justice agency with relevant |
---|
24 | 22 | | information on the recidivism of: |
---|
25 | 23 | | (A) inmates sentenced to the institutional |
---|
26 | 24 | | division; and |
---|
27 | 25 | | (B) releasees under the supervision of the |
---|
28 | 26 | | division; and |
---|
29 | 27 | | (2) may use information for a select group of inmates |
---|
30 | 28 | | based on an acceptable research methodology. |
---|
31 | 29 | | (c) In evaluating the effectiveness of the assessments, the |
---|
32 | 30 | | board shall compare and analyze the recidivism rates and parole |
---|
33 | 31 | | guideline score of the inmates used in the study. The board shall |
---|
34 | 32 | | determine for each category or score within the parole guidelines: |
---|
35 | 33 | | (1) the number of inmates released on parole who are |
---|
36 | 34 | | convicted of a misdemeanor offense following release on parole; |
---|
37 | 35 | | (2) the number of inmates released on parole who are |
---|
38 | 36 | | convicted of a felony offense following release on parole; and |
---|
39 | 37 | | (3) the number of inmates released on parole who have |
---|
40 | 38 | | had parole revoked for a reason other than a new conviction. |
---|
41 | 39 | | (d) Not later than January 1, 2019, the board shall submit a |
---|
42 | 40 | | report on the results of the study to the governor, the lieutenant |
---|
43 | 41 | | governor, and each member of the legislature. The report must |
---|
44 | 42 | | include any recommendations the board considers necessary to |
---|
45 | 43 | | improve the parole decision-making process, including any changes |
---|
46 | 44 | | to the assessments used or to the parole guidelines or recommended |
---|
47 | 45 | | parole approval rates described by Section 508.144. |
---|
48 | 46 | | (e) This section expires August 31, 2019. |
---|
49 | 47 | | SECTION 2. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives |
---|
50 | 48 | | a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as |
---|
51 | 49 | | provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this |
---|
52 | 50 | | Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this |
---|
53 | 51 | | Act takes effect September 1, 2017. |
---|