Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2468 Latest Draft

Bill / House Committee Report Version Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            85R22854 JRR-D
 By: Davis of Harris H.B. No. 2468
 Substitute the following for H.B. No. 2468:
 By:  Davis of Harris C.S.H.B. No. 2468


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to a study on the assessments used by the Board of Pardons
 and Paroles to make parole decisions.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter E, Chapter 508, Government Code, is
 amended by adding Section 508.1446 to read as follows:
 Sec. 508.1446.  STUDY ON ASSESSMENTS USED DURING PAROLE
 DECISIONS. (a) The board shall conduct a study on the
 effectiveness of the assessment components of the parole guidelines
 adopted under Section 508.144 and used by the board and parole
 panels in determining which inmates should be released on parole.
 (b)  In conducting the study, the board:
 (1)  shall obtain information on inmates considered for
 parole during the period beginning January 1, 2015, and ending
 December 31, 2017, from the Texas Board of Criminal Justice, the
 department, and any other criminal justice agency with relevant
 information on the recidivism of:
 (A)  inmates sentenced to the institutional
 division; and
 (B)  releasees under the supervision of the
 division; and
 (2)  may use information for a select group of inmates
 based on an acceptable research methodology.
 (c)  In evaluating the effectiveness of the assessments, the
 board shall compare and analyze the recidivism rates and parole
 guideline score of the inmates used in the study. The board shall
 determine for each category or score within the parole guidelines:
 (1)  the number of inmates released on parole who are
 convicted of a misdemeanor offense following release on parole;
 (2)  the number of inmates released on parole who are
 convicted of a felony offense following release on parole; and
 (3)  the number of inmates released on parole who have
 had parole revoked for a reason other than a new conviction.
 (d)  Not later than January 1, 2019, the board shall submit a
 report on the results of the study to the governor, the lieutenant
 governor, and each member of the legislature. The report must
 include any recommendations the board considers necessary to
 improve the parole decision-making process, including any changes
 to the assessments used or to the parole guidelines or recommended
 parole approval rates described by Section 508.144.
 (e)  This section expires August 31, 2019.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2017.