E | 06/15/2017 | Vetoed by the Governor | Journal Page: 6066 | |
E | 05/25/2017 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 5573 | |
Senate | 05/25/2017 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 3317 | |
House | 05/24/2017 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 4804 | |
House | 05/23/2017 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 4837 | |
House | 05/20/2017 | Senate passage reported | Journal Page: 3999 | |
Senate | 05/19/2017 | Passed | Journal Page: 2237 | |
Senate | 05/19/2017 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2237 | |
Senate | 05/19/2017 | Record vote | Journal Page: 2237 | |
Senate | 05/19/2017 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 2237 | |
Senate | 05/19/2017 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2237 | |
Senate | 05/19/2017 | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 2237 | |
Senate | 05/19/2017 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 2237 | |
Senate | 05/19/2017 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 05/15/2017 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 05/15/2017 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 05/15/2017 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 1952 | |
Senate | 05/15/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/15/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 05/09/2017 | Referred to Finance | Journal Page: 1761 | |
Senate | 05/09/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1761 | |
Senate | 05/05/2017 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1670 | |
House | 05/05/2017 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 2886 | |
House | 05/04/2017 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2518 | |
House | 05/04/2017 | Record vote | RV#735 | Journal Page: 2519 |
House | 05/04/2017 | Passed | Journal Page: 2519 | |
House | 05/04/2017 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2519 | |
House | 05/04/2017 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 2470 | |
House | 05/04/2017 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2470 | |
House | 05/04/2017 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | ||
House | 05/02/2017 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | ||
House | 04/18/2017 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 04/17/2017 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/17/2017 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1574 | |
House | 04/12/2017 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/12/2017 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 04/12/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/05/2017 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/05/2017 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/05/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/05/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/21/2017 | Referred to Ways & Means | Journal Page: 765 | |
House | 03/21/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 765 | |
House | 02/27/2017 | Filed |