Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2475 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Davis of Harris (Senate Sponsor - Bettencourt) H.B. No. 2475
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 5, 2017;
 May 9, 2017, read first time and referred to Committee on Finance;
 May 15, 2017, reported favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 9,
 Nays 0; May 15, 2017, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the sales and use tax exemption for certain amusement
 services.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 151.3101, Tax Code, is amended by adding
 Subsection (d) to read as follows:
 (d)  An amusement service remains exclusively provided under
 Subsection (a)(3) or (5) if an entity described by Subsection
 (a)(3) or (5) contracts with another entity not listed in or
 described by Subsection (a) to provide touring Broadway
 productions:
 (1)  subject to a contract with the other entity for:
 (A)  a term of at least five years; and
 (B)  at least five presentations each year; and
 (2)  held at a location either owned by, or leased or
 licensed for a term of at least one year to, the contracting entity
 described by Subsection (a)(3) or (5).
 SECTION 2.  The change in law made by this Act does not
 affect taxes imposed before the effective date of this Act, and the
 law in effect before the effective date of this Act is continued in
 effect for purposes of the liability for and collection of those
 taxes.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *